AZ HB2422 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle towing
Title
Vehicle towing
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Chapter 307 | |
2015-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-02 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |