AZ HB2420 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-15)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation
Title
Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-29 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |