AZ HB2411 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Convictions; penalties; surcharge distribution
Title
Convictions; penalties; surcharge distribution
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 191.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |