AZ HB2405 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; bonded indebtedness; temporary increase.
Title
Schools; bonded indebtedness; temporary increase.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-19-0-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-25 | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |