AZ HB2345 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; condominiums; fees; signs
Title
Homeowners' associations; condominiums; fees; signs
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] |
Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Jerry Weiers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-08 | House final reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Consent Calendar March 29, 2010 @ 4:03 PM with Objections | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-2-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (53-0-6-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |