AZ HB2309 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Violent; disorderly assembly; public order
Title
Violent; disorderly assembly; public order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Criminal Code - Title 13
Disorderly Assembly
Offenses Against Public Order
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Order
Violent
Disorderly Assembly
Offenses Against Public Order
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Order
Violent
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2925 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |