AZ HB2243 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1149
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational and professional licensure; notice
Title
Occupational and professional licensure; notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1149 (Replaced by) 2021-02-12 - Chapter 16
Subjects
Board Licensure
Certification
Notice
Occupational Licensure
Professional Licensure
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Registration
Certification
Notice
Occupational Licensure
Professional Licensure
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Registration