AZ HB2242 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; revisions; county islands
Title
Fire districts; revisions; county islands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 93 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
County Island
Fire Districts
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
County Island
Fire Districts
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48