AZ HB2220 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electronic files; access; official record

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic files; access; official record

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateChapter 51
2017-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-21HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-09SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-25HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12284.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68736
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2220p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2220h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0051.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2220judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2220rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2220farnsworth e.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68736&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68736&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68736&billStatusActionId=174680&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68736&billStatusActionId=174480&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68736&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68736&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68736&billStatusActionId=176606&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback