AZ HB2218 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Irrigation districts; contracts; certification board
Title
Irrigation districts; contracts; certification board
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] | Rep. Douglas Quelland [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Rep. James Weiers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-08 | House final reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-16 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-03 | House Consent Calendar February 03, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-03 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | House WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House WE Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House WE Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |