AZ HB2178 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of state; notary public
Title
Secretary of state; notary public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Chapter 13 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-25 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Notaries Public
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Secretary Of State
State Government - Title 41
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Secretary Of State
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 294 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 352 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 353 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 354 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 355 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 357 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 358 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 359 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 360 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 361 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 362 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 363 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 364 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 365 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 366 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 367 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 368 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 369 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 370 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 7011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |