AZ HB2156 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Governmental entities; proxy voting; prohibitions
Title
Governmental entities; proxy voting; prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Governmental Entities
Investment Managers
List
Posting
Prohibition
Proxy Voting
Public Finances - Title 35
State Investments
State Treasurer
Investment Managers
List
Posting
Prohibition
Proxy Voting
Public Finances - Title 35
State Investments
State Treasurer