AZ HB2097 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gray water; definition; residential standards
Title
Gray water; definition; residential standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-1-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-27 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Gray Water
Legislative Intent
Residential Standards
The Environment - Title 49
Water Quality
Definition
Gray Water
Legislative Intent
Residential Standards
The Environment - Title 49
Water Quality
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |