AZ HB2089 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to Senate GR Committee
Pending: Senate Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to Senate GR Committee
Pending: Senate Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unrestrained minors; motor vehicles; prohibition
Title
Unrestrained minors; motor vehicles; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (35-24-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-03 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-1-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |