AZ HB2055 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile court; jurisdiction
Title
Juvenile court; jurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 125 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurs |
2019-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-16 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-30 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-10 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Adjudicated Delinquent
Child Safety - Title 8
Clerk Of Court
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Court
Undesignated Felonies
Child Safety - Title 8
Clerk Of Court
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Court
Undesignated Felonies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 348.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 349 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |