AZ HB2050 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Federal office; online signature collection
Title
Federal office; online signature collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 176 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (52-2-6-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-5-0-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |