AZ HB2048 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; producer fees
Title
Insurance; producer fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-1-0) |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-11 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefile |