AZ HB2043 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Employer liability; COVID-19 vaccine requirement
Title
Employer liability; COVID-19 vaccine requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Civil Liability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Covid-19 Vaccine
Employer Liability
Requirements
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Covid-19 Vaccine
Employer Liability
Requirements