AZ HB2041 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ballot fraud countermeasures; paper; ink
Title
Ballot fraud countermeasures; paper; ink
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Joseph Chaplik [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Rep. Quang Nguyen [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Appropriations
Ballot Fraud Countermeasures
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Ink
Paper
Ballot Fraud Countermeasures
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Ink
Paper