AR SB584 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB584 is now Act 636
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program; To Establish Procedures And Funding Requirements To Create Or Amend Scholarships Funded With Net Revenue Available; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program; To Establish Procedures And Funding Requirements To Create Or Amend Scholarships Funded With Net Revenue Available; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateNotification that SB584 is now Act 636
2021-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-07SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-07SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-07HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-07HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-31SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-30SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-30SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended.
2021-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-03-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback