AR SB527 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that SB527 is now Act 740
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that SB527 is now Act 740
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Concerning Abortion Facilities.
Title
To Amend The Laws Concerning Abortion Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Howard Beaty [R] | Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] |
Rep. Joe Cloud [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Tony Furman [R] | Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] |
Sen. Clint Penzo [R] | Sen. Charles Beckham [R] | Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] |
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] |
Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Notification that SB527 is now Act 740 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |