AR HR1014 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Honor Willie Kavanaugh Hocker As The Creator Of The Arkansas State Flag; To Commemorate The 100th Anniversary Of The Arkansas State Flag; And To Support An Appropriate Memorial In Wabbaseka, Arkansas.
Title
To Honor Willie Kavanaugh Hocker As The Creator Of The Arkansas State Flag; To Commemorate The 100th Anniversary Of The Arkansas State Flag; And To Support An Appropriate Memorial In Wabbaseka, Arkansas.
Sponsors
Rep. James Word [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Resolution received unanimous support. |
2013-02-26 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1014 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HR1014.pdf |