AR HR1002 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Congratulate The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts On Being Ranked Number Ten (10) In The Country By The Daily Beast In Its 2014 Survey Of “america’s Top High Schools”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Congratulate The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts On Being Ranked Number Ten (10) In The Country By The Daily Beast In Its 2014 Survey Of “america’s Top High Schools”.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-27HouseResolution received unanimous support.
2015-01-27HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2015-01-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2014-12-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback