AR HJR1016 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Voter Identification When Casting A Ballot.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Voter Identification When Casting A Ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Motion to suspend the rules to place HJR 1016 on the calendar PASSED. (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Motion to suspend the rules to place HJR 1016 on the calendar PASSED. (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Motion to suspend the rules to place HJR 1016 on the calendar PASSED. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-23 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |