AR HB2063 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - House Notification that HB2063 is now Act 750
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - House Notification that HB2063 is now Act 750
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Department Of Information Systems To Develop And Clarify Accessibility Standards For The Visually Impaired.
Title
To Require The Department Of Information Systems To Develop And Clarify Accessibility Standards For The Visually Impaired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | House Notification that HB2063 is now Act 750 | |
2011-03-24 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-23 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-15 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |