AR HB1626 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1626 is now Act 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Process Governing The Disclosure Of A Public Employee's Gross Salary Amount Under The Freedom Of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Process Governing The Disclosure Of A Public Employee's Gross Salary Amount Under The Freedom Of Information Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseNotification that HB1626 is now Act 658
2021-04-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback