AR HB1536 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1536 is now Act 1209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To Promote Local Milk Products; To Allow The Incidental Sale Of Whole Milk That Is Not Pasteurized; And To Allow The State Board Of Health To Make Rules For The Sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Promote Local Milk Products; To Allow The Incidental Sale Of Whole Milk That Is Not Pasteurized; And To Allow The State Board Of Health To Make Rules For The Sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-12HouseNotification that HB1536 is now Act 1209
2013-04-11HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-10HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
2013-04-06SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-06HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2013-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-01HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-13HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2013-02-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback