AR HB1474 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - House Notification that HB1474 is now Act 740
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - House Notification that HB1474 is now Act 740
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Extend The Time In Which Certain Lands May Be Detached After An Annexation Proceeding.
Title
To Extend The Time In Which Certain Lands May Be Detached After An Annexation Proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | House Notification that HB1474 is now Act 740 | |
2011-03-24 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-23 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-14 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-03-11 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-08 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-08 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-08 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-22 | House Filed |