AR HB1402 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Notification that HB1402 is now Act 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Notification that HB1402 is now Act 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Department Of Health's Potential Future Recognition Of A Legal Marijuana-derived Schedule Vi Controlled Substance Prescription.
Title
Concerning The Department Of Health's Potential Future Recognition Of A Legal Marijuana-derived Schedule Vi Controlled Substance Prescription.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Notification that HB1402 is now Act 440 |
2017-03-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |