AR HB1388 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Out-of-state Sellers And Facilitators To Provide Notice To Arkansas Purchasers Regarding Tax Due On Certain Purchases And To Report Sales Made To Arkansas Purchasers.
Title
To Require Out-of-state Sellers And Facilitators To Provide Notice To Arkansas Purchasers Regarding Tax Due On Certain Purchases And To Report Sales Made To Arkansas Purchasers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-03 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-01-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed |