AR HB1136 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Remove The Licensure Requirement Of "good Moral Character" From The Social Work Licensing Act.
Title
To Remove The Licensure Requirement Of "good Moral Character" From The Social Work Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Roll call was requested. Five hands were seen. Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1136 failed to pass carried. (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Roll call was requested. Five hands were seen. Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1136 failed to pass carried. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1136 Failed to Pass. Motion failed. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-01-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed |