AR HB1057 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that HB1057 is now Act 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Add Criminal Background Check Procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Add Criminal Background Check Procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House of Representatives - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseNotification that HB1057 is now Act 545
2017-03-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-14HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-14SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-13SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2016-12-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback