AL HB682 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., add'l court costs, distrib. to offices of circuit clerk and District Attorney
Title
Morgan Co., add'l court costs, distrib. to offices of circuit clerk and District Attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-06-02 | House | Engrossed |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1198 |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1197 |
2015-06-02 | House | Johnson (K) Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |