AL HB456 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Affairs Commission, appropriation from Indian Children's Scholarship Fund for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012
Title
Indian Affairs Commission, appropriation from Indian Children's Scholarship Fund for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |