AL HB355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coosa Co., tobacco tax, distrib. of a portion to co. general fund, Sec. 45-19-245 am'd.
Title
Coosa Co., tobacco tax, distrib. of a portion to co. general fund, Sec. 45-19-245 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-202. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018. |
2018-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 553 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 228 |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |