AK SB32 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the sale of timber on state land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Timber Sales
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 32(RES)? Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/16 |
2016-08-31 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 42 SLA 16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | 11:00 AM 7/1/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2016-04-16 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2016-04-15 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 32(RES) |
2016-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-15 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N3 E1 A5 |
2016-04-15 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2016-04-15 | House | KAWASAKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2016-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-15 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E4 |
2016-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 32(RES) |
2016-04-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-15 | House | RES HCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-04-12 | House | THOMPSON |
2016-04-12 | House | DP: SADDLER, KAWASAKI, GATTIS, GARA, WILSON, EDGMON, MUNOZ, GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, |
2016-04-12 | House | FIN RPT HCS(RES) 10DP |
2016-04-05 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-04-05 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, HERRON, SEATON, TARR |
2016-04-05 | House | DP: JOHNSON, CHENAULT, OLSON, TALERICO, NAGEAK |
2016-04-05 | House | RES RPT HCS(RES) 5DP 4NR |
2015-04-17 | House | RES, FIN |
2015-04-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 32(RES) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2015-04-17 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-17 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2015-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 32(RES) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2015-04-16 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, OLSON |
2015-03-27 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN |
2015-03-27 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 2NR |
2015-02-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STOLTZE |
2015-02-27 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STEDMAN |
2015-02-27 | Senate | RES RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2015-01-30 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2015-01-30 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2015-01-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |