AK SB24 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska Marine Transportation Advisory Board.
Title
Marine Transportation Advisory Board
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Rep. Alan Austerman [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 24? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate:
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate:
SB 24 Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/1/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 40 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | 2:05 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-24 | House | FN2: (DOT) |
2013-06-24 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65 |
2013-06-24 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2013-04-12 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 24(TRA) |
2013-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2013-04-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, TUCK, KERTTULA |
2013-04-12 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 24(TRA) |
2013-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | House | TRA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | FN2: (DOT) |
2013-04-11 | House | NR: KAWASAKI |
2013-04-11 | House | AUSTERMAN |
2013-04-11 | House | DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, |
2013-04-11 | House | FIN RPT HCS(TRA) 10DP 1NR |
2013-04-05 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2013-04-05 | House | DP: LYNN, FEIGE, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON |
2013-04-05 | House | TRA RPT HCS(TRA) 6DP |
2013-04-01 | House | TRA, FIN |
2013-04-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-29 | Senate | VERSION: SB 24 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 24 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2013-03-15 | Senate | DP: MEYER, BISHOP |
2013-03-15 | Senate | FIN RPT 2DP 3NR |
2013-02-20 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | NR: FRENCH |
2013-02-20 | Senate | DP: EGAN, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH |
2013-02-20 | Senate | TRA RPT 4DP 1NR |
2013-01-22 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE |
2013-01-18 | Senate | TRA, FIN |
2013-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |