AK HB33 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing May 31 of each year as Katie John Day.
Title
Establish May 31 As Katie John Day
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Foster [D] | Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Rep. Zach Fansler [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2017-04-19 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-04-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-04-19 | House | NR: SADDLER |
2017-04-19 | House | DP: TALERICO, WESTLAKE, RAUSCHER, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-04-19 | House | CRA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER |
2017-01-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2017-01-18 | House | CRA |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB33 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0033A.PDF |