WY SF1009 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the COVID-19 public health emergency; providing limitations on requiring COVID 19 vaccinations as specified; specifying liability for employers whose employees separate or are terminated because of a COVID-19 vaccination requirement; establishing a cause of action for damages as specified; appropriating funds for litigation purposes as specified; providing definitions; amending exemptions for immunizations and treatments as specified; amending the worker's compensation program to provide a presumption that an injury caused by a mandated or required COVID 19 vaccination is compensable as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
COVID-19 response-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-10-27 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-21 | Bill Number Assigned |