WY SF0159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; creating the tax reform 2020 committee as specified; requiring a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tax reform 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |