WY SF0136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; authorizing the public service commission to consider reliability and cost externalities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public service commission considerations.
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 128 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0049 | |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0049 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-24 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-10 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |