WY SF0130 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 182 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming lottery; requiring reports to the joint travel, recreation, wildlife and cultural resources interim committee; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery commission reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0130JC001: 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0130JC001: 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0130JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0130JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 182 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0084
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0084
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0084
2015-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0084
2015-03-05HouseAdopted SF0130JC001: 34-25-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateAdopted SF0130JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-04HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-02SenateConcur:Failed 2-27-1-0-0
2015-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2015-02-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-25 Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2015-02-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2015-02-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-06SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-03SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-03 Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback