WY SF0129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; amending and eliminating reporting requirements as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Adopted SF0129JC001: 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Adopted SF0129JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Adopted SF0129JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 102 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0052 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0052 | |
2019-02-14 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |