WY SF0124 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0096
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; increasing fines for overweight and oversize vehicles; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overweight and oversize vehicle penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0096
2011-03-03 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0096
2011-03-03 Assigned Number SEA0096
2011-03-03 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Case, Christensen, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hicks, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Bebout, Burns, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Hines, Jennings, Meier, Nutting, Perkins and Peterson. Excused: Senator(s) Geis Ayes 16 Nays 13 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-03-03 (S) Adopted SF0124JC01
2011-03-02 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-03-01 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-03-01 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Burns, Case, Christensen, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Ross, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Rothfuss and Schiffer. Ayes 14 Nays 16 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-03-01 (S) Did Not Concur
2011-02-28 (S) Received for Concurrence
2011-02-28 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Steward, Stubson, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Davison, Gay, Miller, Semlek, Shepperson and Teeters. Excused: Representative(s) Pederson Ayes 52 Nays 7 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-24 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-02-18 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-18 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blake, Bonner, Botten, Cannady, McKim, Petersen, Quarberg, Vranish and Zwonitzer, Dv. Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-18 (H08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-03 (H) Introduced and Referred to H08
2011-02-02 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-02-01 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Burns, Case, Cooper, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nutting, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Bebout, Christensen, Coe, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Jennings, Meier, Nicholas P, Perkins and Peterson. Ayes 18 Nays 12 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-01 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-31 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-28 (S) Passed CoW
2011-01-28 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-28 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-28 (S) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-27 (S) Placed on General File
2011-01-27 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Cooper, Johnson, Landen, Nutting and Schiffer Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-27 (S08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-21 (S) Introduced and Referred to S08
2011-01-21 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback