WY SF0111 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating a new offense for child abuse; providing a penalty; providing exceptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child abuse-change of sex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-9-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-9-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-30 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |