WY SF0099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; authorizing counting of ballots at a central counting location; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting systems and ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 159
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0057
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0057
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0057
2019-02-22 Assigned Number SEA No. 0057
2019-02-22SenateConcur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2019-02-22SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-12HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-02-04HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-31Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-29SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback