WY SF0087 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending the elements and penalties of the crime of voyeurism; authorizing the imposition of specified probation conditions for those persons convicted of voyeurism; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Voyeurism amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Sandy Newsome [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Lynn Hutchings [R] |
Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Adopted SF0087JC001: 39-18-3-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0087JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0087JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Assigned Chapter Number 141 | |
2021-04-07 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0069 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0069 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0069 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0069 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |