WY SF0070 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public education; creating the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act and establishing a statewide education accountability system; modifying statewide assessment requirements; establishing system components and student performance measures; imposing duties upon the state board of education and the state superintendent; prescribing consequences for school level student performance; establishing a legislative select committee to review and expand system components; imposing select committee reporting requirements and providing for an advisory committee comprised of public education representatives; prescribing staffing; providing appropriations; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Education accountability.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - H Adopted SF0070JC01 (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S Adopted SF0070JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S Adopted SF0070JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0090 | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0090 | |
2011-03-03 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0090 | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0090 | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Adopted SF0070JC01 | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Adopted SF0070JC01 | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-22 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-01 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-26 | (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |