WY SF0060 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Wildlife and Natural Resource Funding Act; providing for funding of large projects under the act; specifying large projects approved for funding in 2024; specifying conditions for large project funding; authorizing distributions from the Wyoming wildlife and natural resource trust income account for approved large projects; providing for the reversion of funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
2024 large project funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-4-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number 51 | |
2024-03-07 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0010 | |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0010 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0010 |
2024-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0010 | |
2024-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-4-0-0 |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-23 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-22 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2024-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-14 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |