WY SF0051 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to commercial driver's licenses; amending commercial driver's license statutes to comply with federal law; renaming commercial driver instruction permits; amending definitions; amending renewal and waiting periods; providing age limits; amending skills tester requirements; specifying the form of permits; specifying when commercial driver's license applicants are disqualified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Act compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA0029 | |
2013-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0029 |
2013-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA0029 | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-26 | Bill Number Assigned |